Financial history THE WORCESTER ST JOHNS TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD

Charity number: 1083342
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2015 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019
Total gross income £3.06k £2.36k £2.38k £1.86k £1.64k
Total expenditure £2.07k £1.52k £1.59k £1.22k £1.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A