Accounts and annual returns THE BREWERS' GUILD TRUST

Charity number: 1084002
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 31 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 20 August 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 20 August 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 22 June 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 22 June 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2004 13 October 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 13 October 2005 On Time