Financial history BERKSHIRE AFRICAN CONNECTIONS

Charity number: 1085539
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £860 £460 £200 £200 £200
Total expenditure £660 £400 £205 £200 £200
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A