Accounts and annual returns THE MIRANDA CURTIS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1085958
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2013 02 October 2014 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2012 09 October 2013 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2012 Not Required