Accounts and annual returns CLIFFORD CHAMBERS VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1089041
Charity reporting is up to date (105 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 13 February 2025 105 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required