Financial history THRIPLOW SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1084152
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £33.52k £7.25k £268.25k £37.94k £9.37k
Total expenditure £1.68k £2.10k £6.13k £22.06k £322.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A