Financial history KING GEORGE V PLAYING FIELD - TARVIN

Charity number: 1083973
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.41k £5.70k £5.31k £7.37k £4.79k
Total expenditure £5.41k £5.70k £5.31k £7.37k £4.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A