Accounts and annual returns THE WELLSPRING COMMUNITY CHURCH (PETERBOROUGH) TRUST

Charity number: 1085007
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 11 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 11 November 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 14 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 20 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 05 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 15 November 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 14 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 14 November 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 04 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 04 November 2005 On Time