Governing document UPSTREAM HEALTHY LIVING CENTRE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 NOVEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 21 MAY 2001, 24 FEBRUARY 2003, 25 FEBRUARY 2004 AND 16 NOVEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT (AS DEFINED BELOW) WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH ACTIVITIES BY REASON OF AGE, SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. 3.2 THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH, ESPECIALLY AMONG ADULTS, WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 3.3 THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION, ESPECIALLY AMONG ADULTS, WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 3.4 TO PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL BEING OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, ESPECIALLY THE ELDERLY AND INFIRM, PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE ARTS. THE AREA OF BENEFIT SHALL BE THE AREA OF DEVON: PROVIDED ALWAYS FOR THE AVOIDANCE OF DOUBT THAT THE CHARITY MAY CARRY OUT ACTIVITIES IN OTHER AREAS WHICH ARE BENEFICIAL TO ITS ACTIVITIES IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 2. THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH OF THOSE PERSONS OVER THE AGE OF 55 WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT 3. THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION OF THOSE PERSONS OVER THE AGE OF 55 WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT 4. THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY AND INFIRM WITHIN THE ARE OF BENEFIT (PRIMARILY BUT NOT SPECIFICALLY) THROUGH THE ARTS. THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREA OF MID DEVON: PROVIDED ALWAYS FOR AVOIDANCE OF DOUBT THAT THE CHARITY MAY CARRY OUT ACTIVITIES IN OTHER AREAS WHICH ARE BENEFICIAL TO ITS ACTIVITIES AND ALSO ACTIVITIES REASONABLY ADJACENT TO THE BOUNDARIES SO DEFINED
Area of benefit
THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREA OF MID DEVON AND THE LARGER AREA OF MID-DEVON PRIMARY CARE TRUST
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.