Accounts and annual returns PECKHAM VOLUNTARY SECTOR FORUM

Charity number: 1087384
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 January 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 23 December 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 23 December 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 15 December 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014

(These accounts
have been qualified)

15 December 2014 On Time