Financial history WOLVERHAMPTON ASIAN CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity Number: 1086135
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £65.42k £40.20k £62.72k £62.61k £75.00k
Total expenditure £44.75k £29.92k £39.81k £55.26k £53.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A