Accounts and annual returns HSBC GLOBAL EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1084542
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 18 May 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 18 May 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2008 12 May 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 14 May 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 07 August 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 07 August 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 25 July 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 25 July 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 27 July 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 08 August 2006 On Time