Accounts and annual returns PONTFADOG CP SCHOOL PTA

Charity Number: 1085569
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2010 24 June 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2009 24 June 2011 297 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2009 Not Required