Trustees ASSOCIATION OF LIGHTHOUSE KEEPERS
Charity number: 1089142

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEIL HARGREAVES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Bridget Alison Box | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jill Murphy | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Hogarth | Trustee | 03 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Kerr | Trustee | 27 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
DR Stephen Pickles | Trustee | 30 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Linda Sunderland | Trustee | 27 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
John Best | Trustee | 27 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rodney Jagelman | Trustee | 27 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
David Kelman Taylor | Trustee | 27 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROY THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR DAVE WILKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.