Accounts and annual returns NEW CENTURY ARTS

Charity number: 1085928
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2010 20 April 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2010 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2009 18 March 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 Not Required