Financial history BOLTON-BY-BOWLAND YFC YOUNG FARMER'S CLUB

Charity number: 1085589
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2004 31/08/2005 31/08/2006 31/08/2007 31/08/2008
Total gross income £2.75k £8.20k £4.49k £18.22k £16.54k
Total expenditure £3.38k £7.32k £2.42k £14.94k £17.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A