Financial history THE CAMBRIDGE MONGOLIA DEVELOPMENT APPEAL

Charity number: 1086778
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2014 30/06/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £12.15k £36.74k £32.72k £24.55k £31.65k
Total expenditure £15.75k £38.34k £34.15k £23.41k £30.44k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A