Financial history EQUAL CARE AND OPPORTUNITY (ANDOVER)

Charity number: 1084551
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £6.77k £7.59k £6.22k £4.97k £6.09k
Total expenditure £6.16k £6.97k £7.01k £6.22k £4.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A