Financial history THE REDDITCH ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1086399
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.34k £268 £220 £2.46k £3.21k
Total expenditure £1.35k £132 £1.09k £3.22k £3.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A