Financial history REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD - (RCCG) JESUS PEOPLE PARISH

Charity number: 1084812
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £112.87k £85.43k £114.21k £120.05k £139.37k
Total expenditure £58.62k £44.16k £66.03k £79.41k £105.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A