Financial history 1ST WATERINGBURY RAINBOWS

Charity number: 1084868
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.31k £295 £1.02k £1.80k £1.80k
Total expenditure £1.31k £371 £1.02k £1.55k £1.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A