Accounts and annual returns FORT WATCH HOUSE MANAGEMENT

Charity number: 1087166
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2008 17 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 10 January 2009 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 12 April 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 21 April 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required