Financial history NENE VALLEY CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity Number: 1085329
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £261.37k £267.72k £190.57k £143.46k £0
Total expenditure £219.08k £272.71k £177.87k £172.22k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A