Financial history FRIENDS OF AB KETTLEBY SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1085258
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.68k £2.37k £11.35k £16.80k £13.16k
Total expenditure £2.90k £5.62k £7.39k £18.02k £15.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A