Financial history CHURCH AND POORS LAND CHARITY

Charity Number: 1085321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.61k £2.66k £2.85k £2.62k £2.92k
Total expenditure £1.46k £857 £851 £5.63k £1.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A