Accounts and annual returns CAMDEN CENTRAL COMMUNITY UMBRELLA

Charity number: 1094027
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 29 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 22 August 2012 204 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 25 June 2012 146 days late
Annual return 31 March 2010 14 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required