Accounts and annual returns ISLINGTON CARERS CENTRE

Charity number: 1085341
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 04 June 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 04 June 2013 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 04 June 2013 124 days late
Annual return 31 March 2011 19 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 19 January 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 08 December 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 08 December 2010 On Time