Financial history ST JOSEPH'S PLAYGROUP, HERTFORD

Charity number: 1089180
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £87.89k £83.97k £91.58k £100.51k £99.42k
Total expenditure £85.74k £81.90k £97.25k £102.47k £103.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A