Accounts and annual returns THE MAYOR OF THE BOROUGH OF BURNLEY'S CHARITY FUND

Charity number: 1085460
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 26 May 2024 24 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 26 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 26 May 2023 25 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 26 May 2023 25 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 26 May 2022 13 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 26 May 2022 13 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 26 May 2021 15 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 26 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 26 May 2020 25 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 26 May 2020 Not Required