Financial history HOPE LONDON COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity number: 1089232
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £75.64k £72.95k £36.90k £13.67k £33.22k
Total expenditure £64.22k £25.43k £7.28k £13.85k £21.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A