Governing document LONG SUTTON CEVA PRIMARY SCHOOL PTFA
Charity number: 1086360

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 FEBRUARY 2001 AMENDED 8 NOVEMBER 2004 AND 22 MARCH 2005. AS AMENDED ON 19 OCT 2010 AS AMENDED ON 14 OCT 2015 AS AMENDED ON 18 SEP 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
LONG SUTTON CEVA PRIMARY SCHOOL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.