Accounts and annual returns KING GEORGE V PLAYING FIELD - KEGWORTH

Charity number: 1085693
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 13 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 03 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2004 14 March 2005 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Not Required