Financial history MULTI AGENCY RESOURCE CENTRE (BROMSGROVE AND DISTRICT) LIMITED

Charity number: 1088694
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2004 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008
Total gross income £382.54k £368.48k £543.66k £525.00k £445.84k
Total expenditure £369.84k £393.00k £518.17k £530.53k £582.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £6.90k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £7.59k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £499.55k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £8.21k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £2.76k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £525.37k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £4.99k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A