Accounts and annual returns CITY REACH YOUTH PROJECT

Charity number: 1086532
Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 June 2024 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 05 June 2024 126 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 February 2023 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 03 February 2023 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 April 2022 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 April 2022 69 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 September 2021 228 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required