Accounts and annual returns DEVELOPMENT IMPACT FOR NIGERIA

Charity number: 1091028
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 December 2024 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 December 2024 412 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 November 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 November 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required