Accounts and annual returns LITTLE BEAVERS PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1086316
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2014 26 March 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2013 25 November 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 25 October 2014 117 days late
Annual return 31 August 2012 25 November 2013 148 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 07 November 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2011 18 April 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 Not Required