Accounts and annual returns KEEN EDGE FOOTBRIDGE DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Charity number: 1089028
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 24 October 2009 | 28 February 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 October 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 24 October 2008 | 17 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 October 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 24 October 2007 | 13 November 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 October 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 24 October 2006 | 30 May 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 October 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 24 October 2005 | 18 April 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 October 2005 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window