Financial history BANBURY PARKINSON'S FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1086931
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £17.50k £6.65k £13.36k £16.31k £19.97k
Total expenditure £18.85k £8.32k £7.65k £18.48k £20.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A