Financial history NOTTINGHAM AND NOTTINGHAMSHIRE REFUGEE FORUM

Charity number: 1086962
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £247.40k £357.76k £39.21k £428.46k £391.47k
Total expenditure £177.21k £314.28k £379.58k £433.78k £388.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A