Financial history TEN TEN TRUST

Charity Number: 1086348
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £10.00k £11.61k £12.03k £7.95k £9.85k
Total expenditure £10.50k £11.93k £10.29k £9.28k £10.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A