Accounts and annual returns THE FELIX TRUST FOR ART

Charity number: 1090195
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 March 2024 16 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 March 2024 16 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 March 2023 08 February 2024 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 March 2022 10 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 March 2021 03 February 2022 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 28 March 2020 08 February 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 March 2020 Not Required