Accounts and annual returns THE BETTY AND MILES PARSONS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1086874
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2009 02 February 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2008 07 July 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2008 07 July 2008 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2007 28 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2007 28 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2006 07 August 2007 183 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2006 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2005 16 February 2006 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2005 Not Required