Financial history RAVENSWORTH SCHOOL FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1087682
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £938 £1.11k £3.77k £6.10k £8.57k
Total expenditure £976 £4.60k £2.78k £3.62k £6.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A