Accounts and annual returns THE SKIPTON AND CRAVEN LIONS CLUB CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1086412
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2011 13 August 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2011 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2010 08 February 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2010 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2009 01 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2008 15 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2008 Not Required