Accounts and annual returns WALES FUNDERS FORUM LIMITED

Charity number: 1087465
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 20 August 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 05 February 2009 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 05 February 2009 371 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 26 February 2008 26 days late