Accounts and annual returns KING GEORGE V PLAYING FIELD WALTON-LE-DALE (HIGHER WALTON)

Charity number: 1086504
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2005 07 February 2006 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2004 18 October 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Not Required