Financial history THE FUN ZONE AFTER SCHOOL CLUB

Charity Number: 1087044
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £65.43k £71.83k £75.04k £74.96k £38.78k
Total expenditure £58.61k £61.04k £70.60k £74.63k £111.59k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A