Accounts and annual returns ALL HEAR FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1086861
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 17 June 2008 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 23 May 2007 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required