Accounts and annual returns KING GEORGE'S PLAYING FIELD, KNEBWORTH

Charity number: 1086526
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 15 November 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 15 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 12 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 22 May 2008 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 30 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required