Accounts and annual returns ECCLESIA MINISTRIES APOSTOLIC CHURCH OF MILTON KEYNES

Charity number: 1090841
Charity reporting is overdue by 1306 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 941 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 941 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1306 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1306 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 March 2020 On Time Download Open in new window